AZ SB1197 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Law enforcement; overtime compensation
Title
Law enforcement; overtime compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Military and Government Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Military and Government Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Governor Signed | |
2012-03-28 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Senate final reading , voting: (22-8-0-0) | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-28 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-28 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-26 | House third reading PASSED voting: (44-10-6-0) | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-19 | House Consent Calendar March 19, 2012 @ 4:40 PM with Objections | |
2012-03-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-3-0) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-03-01 | House read second time | |
2012-02-29 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-27 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-27 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-5-0-0) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-20 | Senate Consent Calendar February 20, 2012 @ 1:20 PM with Objections | |
2012-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Senate VMGA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) | |
2012-01-23 | Referred to Senate VMGA Committee | |
2012-01-23 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Assigned to Senate VMGA Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |