AZ SB1201 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Autocycles; class M license; exemption
Title
Autocycles; class M license; exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor Vetoed | |
2014-04-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-15 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0) |
2014-04-10 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to House TRANS Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |