AZ SB1211 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacists; prescribing; naloxone; reporting
Title
Pharmacists; prescribing; naloxone; reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2024-03-04 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-2-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona State Board Of Pharmacy
Emergency
Exceptions
Immunity
Labels
Misbranding
Naloxone
Opioid Antagonist
Pharmacists
Prescribing
Prescription-only Drug
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Refills
Reporting
Reporting Requirements
Waiver
Emergency
Exceptions
Immunity
Labels
Misbranding
Naloxone
Opioid Antagonist
Pharmacists
Prescribing
Prescription-only Drug
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Refills
Reporting
Reporting Requirements
Waiver
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1907 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1968 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1979 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |