AZ SB1222 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marijuana; transaction privilege tax
Title
Medical marijuana; transaction privilege tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-25 | House third reading , voting: (17-12-1-0) | |
2010-03-18 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-16 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-16 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to House Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to House Committee | |
2010-01-28 | House read second time | |
2010-03-25 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-25 | Senate third reading , voting: (17-12-1-0) | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-15 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0) | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |