AZ SB1226 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-28 - House third reading FAILED voting: (30-28-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-28 - House third reading FAILED voting: (30-28-2-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Issuance; affidavit; arrest warrant
Title
Issuance; affidavit; arrest warrant
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (30-28-2-0) |
2021-03-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-03-17 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Affidavits
Arrest Warrant
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definition
Definitions (h)
Form Of Warrant
Grounds
Issuance
Magistrates
Peace Officer (h)
Arrest Warrant
Criminal Code - Title 13
Definition
Definitions (h)
Form Of Warrant
Grounds
Issuance
Magistrates
Peace Officer (h)