AZ SB1232 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Trusts and estates
Title
Trusts and estates
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Driggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-16 | Governor Signed | |
2013-04-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-04-10 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-04-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2013-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |