AZ SB1243 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Bad checks; county attorney fees
Title
Bad checks; county attorney fees
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Gould [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-12 | House third reading , voting: (40-19-1-0) | |
2011-04-06 | House Consent Calendar April 06, 2011 @ 4:45 PM | |
2011-04-07 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-07 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-24 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-02-22 | House read second time | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-11 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-10 | Senate third reading , voting: (22-7-1-0) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Consent Calendar February 07, 2011 @ 2:45 PM | |
2011-02-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |