AZ SB1243 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Groundwater sales; online exchange.
Title
Groundwater sales; online exchange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), SB1243 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci that pursuant to House Rule 12(P), SB1243 be calendared for an Additional Committee of the Whole for purposes of further amending. Motion passed v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | House refer to additional Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-25 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-03-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-19 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-1-0-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-06 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adwr (see Also: Department Of Water Resources)
Department Of Water Resources (adwr)
Disclosure
Exemption
Groundwater Code
Groundwater Sales
Notice
Online Exchange
Right To Buy And Sell
Waters - Title 45
Weeds And Dust
Department Of Water Resources (adwr)
Disclosure
Exemption
Groundwater Code
Groundwater Sales
Notice
Online Exchange
Right To Buy And Sell
Waters - Title 45
Weeds And Dust