AZ SB1255 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - House third reading FAILED voting: (20-35-5-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - House third reading FAILED voting: (20-35-5-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Guest removal; special detainer action
Title
Guest removal; special detainer action
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 34 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (20-35-5-0) |
2017-04-25 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2017-04-25 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (22-34-3-0) |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-03-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-03-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-03-14 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-21 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COMPS Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 1377 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 1378 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |