AZ SB1258 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Medical records; disclosure; release
Title
Medical records; disclosure; release
Sponsors
Sen. Amanda Aguirre [D] | Sen. Carolyn Allen [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Steve Court [R] |
Sen. Barbara Leff [R] | Rep. Eric Meyer [D] | Rep. Andy Tobin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-08 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Senate HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-0) | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Senate HEALTH Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to Senate HEALTH Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Arizona State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=93&Bill_Number=SB1258 |
Text | http://www.azleg.gov/legtext/49leg/2r/bills/sb1258p.htm |