AZ SB1259 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Foreclosures; proof of ownership
Title
Foreclosures; proof of ownership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Senate final reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | House third reading , voting: (48-11-1-0) | |
2011-04-18 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-1-4-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-15 | House ERA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to House ERA Committee | |
2011-03-14 | House BI Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to House BI Committee | |
2011-03-07 | House read second time | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House ERA Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House BI Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-22 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-2-0-0) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Consent Calendar February 14, 2011 @ 1:30 PM | |
2011-02-17 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Senate BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-2-0) | |
2011-01-27 | Referred to Senate BI Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Assigned to Senate BI Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |