AZ SB1291 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Chapter 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Chapter 178
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tax correction act of 2017
Title
Tax correction act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | Senate | Chapter 178 |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0) |
2017-04-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-03-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 13302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 13351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 3401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 3402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 3403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1029 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1096 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1127 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1130.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 581 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |