AZ SB1297 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agricultural best management committee; continuation
Title
Agricultural best management committee; continuation
Sponsors
Sen. John Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | Governor Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-04-18 | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-5-3-0) | |
2012-04-16 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-04-10 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-10 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-09 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-15 | House AW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) | |
2012-03-15 | Referred to House AW Committee | |
2012-03-15 | House read second time | |
2012-03-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Assigned to House AW Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-03-08 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-08 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Consent Calendar February 13, 2012 @ 1:30 PM with Objections | |
2012-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |