AZ SB1310 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
JTEDs; omnibus
Title
JTEDs; omnibus
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Crandall [R] | Sen. John Huppenthal [R] | Rep. Eric Meyer [D] | Sen. David Schapira [D] |
Rep. Nancy Wright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-22 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |