AZ SB1321 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Residential energy efficiency; building codes
Title
Residential energy efficiency; building codes
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Steve Farley [D] | Sen. Chester Crandell [R] |
Sen. Kelli Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - House - House Energy, Environment and Natural Resources Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - Senate - Senate Government and Environment Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | House EENR Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (4-4-0-0-0) |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to House EENR Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2013-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Assigned to House EENR Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-10-2-0) |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate GE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate GE Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GE Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |