AZ SB1322 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cities; services; managed competition
Title
Cities; services; managed competition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Governor Vetoed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | Senate final reading , voting: (20-7-3-0) | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-15 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-14 | House third reading , voting: (34-22-4-0) | |
2011-04-13 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2011-04-06 | House Consent Calendar April 06, 2011 @ 4:45 PM with Objections | |
2011-04-07 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-07 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-22 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2011-03-22 | House read second time | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-14 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-14 | Senate third reading , voting: (18-10-2-0) | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Senate GR Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0) | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |