AZ SB1334 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Referred to House TI Committee
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - Referred to House TI Committee
Pending: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Cellular telephone use; texting; driving
Title
Cellular telephone use; texting; driving
Sponsors
Sen. Amanda Aguirre [D] | Sen. Carolyn Allen [R] | Sen. Steve Farley [D] | Rep. Matthew Heinz [D] |
Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Rep. Stephen Pierce [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2010-03-24 | House read second time | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-22 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-22 | Senate third reading , voting: (19-10-1-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Failed To Pass, voting: (11-11-7-0) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:39 PM with Objections | |
2010-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Senate NRIPD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |