AZ SB1350 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Chapter 208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Chapter 208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Online lodging; administration; definitions
Title
Online lodging; administration; definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Chapter 208 | |
2016-05-12 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (25-3-2-0) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-06 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-6-2-0) |
2016-04-14 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-04-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0) |
2016-03-10 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2016-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-0-0-0) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |