AZ SB1352 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - Senate third reading , voting: (13-16-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-22 - Senate third reading , voting: (13-16-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Theft; catalytic converter
Title
Theft; catalytic converter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Senate third reading , voting: (13-16-1-0) | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |