AZ SB1362 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Abortion; refusal to assist
Title
Abortion; refusal to assist
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-08 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-1-0) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Abortion
Definitions (h)
Emergency Contraception
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Refusal To Assist
Schools
Student
Definitions (h)
Emergency Contraception
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Refusal To Assist
Schools
Student
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 1321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 1322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2154 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |