AZ SB1392 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Chapter 194
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Chapter 194
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Universities; intellectual property.
Title
Universities; intellectual property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Chapter 194 | |
2014-04-23 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-21 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-17 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-4-2-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House HEWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to House HEWD Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | Assigned to House HEWD Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-1-3-0) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |