AZ SB1410 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Marijuana; licensing; delivery
Title
Marijuana; licensing; delivery
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Flavio Bravo [D] | Sen. Janae Shamp [R] | Rep. Michael Carbone [R] |
Rep. Lupe Diaz [R] | Rep. Tim Dunn [R] | Rep. David Marshall [R] | Rep. Anastasia Travers [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-03-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-18 | House | House LARA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-1-1-0-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-06 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adoh (see Also: Arizona Department Of Housing)
Annual Report
Arizona Department Of Housing (adoh)
Housing Trust Fund
Purpose
Rural Areas
State Government - Title 41
Annual Report
Arizona Department Of Housing (adoh)
Housing Trust Fund
Purpose
Rural Areas
State Government - Title 41