AZ SB1412 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Referred to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-16 - Referred to House APPROP Committee
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Nonrestorable defendants; incompetent; involuntary commitment
Title
Nonrestorable defendants; incompetent; involuntary commitment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-15 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-0-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |