AZ SB1447 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
ADE; school finance revisions
Title
ADE; school finance revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (AMEND C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-13 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-06-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2013-06-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-04-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | House read second time |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2013-03-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |