AZ SB1467 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - House TI Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - House TI Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
ADOT; authorized third parties; revocation
Title
ADOT; authorized third parties; revocation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - House Transportation & Infrastructure Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation, Technology and Missing Children Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | House | House TI Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-14 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate TTMC Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TTMC Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adot (see Also: Department Of Transportation)
Appeal
Application Denial
Authorization
Authorized Third Parties
Cancellation
Certification
Certification Revocation
Criminal Records Check
Denial Of Application
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Hearing
Immunity From Costs
Judicial Review
Revocation
Suspension
Transportation - Title 28
Appeal
Application Denial
Authorization
Authorized Third Parties
Cancellation
Certification
Certification Revocation
Criminal Records Check
Denial Of Application
Department Of Transportation (adot)
Hearing
Immunity From Costs
Judicial Review
Revocation
Suspension
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 5105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |