AZ SB1520 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona background clearance card
Title
Arizona background clearance card
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-1-4-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-24 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-15 | House read second time | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-09 | Senate third reading , voting: (23-5-2-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Consent Calendar February 23, 2011 @ 1:35 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |