AZ SB1554 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by HB2755
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Human services; budget reconciliation; 2019-2020
Title
Human services; budget reconciliation; 2019-2020
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. Sonny Borrelli [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] |
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
HB2755 (Replaced by) 2019-05-31 - Chapter 271
Subjects
Annual Report
Appropriating Monies
Budget Bills
Budget Reconciliation
Child Safety - Title 8
Human Services
Marital And Domestic Relations - Title 25
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
State Government - Title 41
Welfare - Title 46
Appropriating Monies
Budget Bills
Budget Reconciliation
Child Safety - Title 8
Human Services
Marital And Domestic Relations - Title 25
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
State Government - Title 41
Welfare - Title 46
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 528 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2960 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
8 | 530.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |