AZ SCM1001 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Introduced in House and read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mortgage standards; urging federal government
Title
Mortgage standards; urging federal government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Financial Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - Senate - Senate Financial Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senate FI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate FI Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FI Committee |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |