AZ SCM1009 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Cherrybell; mail processing center
Title
Cherrybell; mail processing center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Federalism and States' Rights Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2016-05-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (40-14-6-0) |
2016-05-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-04-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | House FSR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-1-0) |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House FSR Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Assigned to House FSR Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |