AZ SCR1004 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate APPROP Committee action: Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; state lands; price
Title
Technical correction; state lands; price
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Biggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Held |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Arizona State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.azleg.gov/DocumentsForBill.asp?Session_ID=112&Bill_Number=SCR1004 |
Text | http://www.azleg.gov/legtext/51leg/2r/bills/scr1004p.htm |