AZ SCR1035 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
English; official language
Title
English; official language
Sponsors
Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Sen. Scott Bundgaard [R] | Rep. Doris Goodale [R] | Sen. Ron Gould [R] |
Sen. Linda Gray [R] | Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Jack Harper [R] | Sen. Lori Klein [R] |
Sen. Russell Pearce [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Sen. Steve Smith [R] |
Sen. Steven Yarbrough [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | House third reading , voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2011-03-14 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to House Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to House Committee | |
2011-02-01 | House read second time | |
2011-03-16 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-15 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |