CA AB1033 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 60605.10 to the Education Code, relating to academic content standards.
Title
Academic content standards: standards review commission.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Feuer [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2011-05-27 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2011-05-11 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2011-05-05 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-04 | Read second time and amended. | |
2011-05-03 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 27). | |
2011-04-04 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 60605.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 60605.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |