CA AB105 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 164.56 and 2106 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 2100) of Division 3 of, to amend and repeal Sections 892.2, 892.4, 892.5, 892.6, 893, 893.2, 893.4, 893.6, 894, 894.2, and 2333.5 of, and to add Chapter 8 (commencing with Section 2380) to Division 3 of, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Active Transportation Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 105 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Assembly - AB 105 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 51 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) . |
2013-08-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 2016.) |
2013-08-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 1404.) |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1312.) Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1313.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1315.) |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2013-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2013-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 164.56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2333.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2380 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 892.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 892.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 892.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 892.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 893 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 893.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 893.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 893.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 894 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 894.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |