CA AB105 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11140, 18502, 18931, 18933, 18936, 19402, and 19574 of, and to add Sections 8310.6, 18553, and 18930.1 to, the Government Code, relating to human resources.
Title
The Upward Mobility Act of 2021: boards and commissions: civil service: examinations: classifications.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Assembly - AB 105 Holden Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB105 Holden et al. By Kamlager (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 105 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB105 Holden et al. By Kamlager (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 105 Holden Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-08 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 12. Page 2990.). |
2021-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2486.). |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-08-23 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 13). |
2021-06-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2021-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-06-09 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R., JUD. and G.O. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 12. Page 1717.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Received by the Desk April 30 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(2). |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-12-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 14. |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18553 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 18930.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 18931 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18933 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 18936 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19574 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8310.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |