CA AB1073 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Rubio.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Rubio.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7284.8 of the Government Code, relating to immigration.
Title
Immigration enforcement activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1073 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1073 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Rubio. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 1576.) |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7284.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |