CA AB1099 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 44664.5 to the Education Code, relating to school accountability.
Title
School accountability: teacher evaluations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1099 OLSEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1099 OLSEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 1). |
2015-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 1636.) |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 20). |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44664.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 52061 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 52067 | Amended Code | Citation Text |