CA AB1107 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-20 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8626.5 to the Government Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Proclaimed state emergencies: proclamations, materials, and announcements: translation.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1107 Chu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1107 Chu Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2020-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-05-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-04-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 1468.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8626.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |