CA AB112 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-13 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-13 - Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23320 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 12815, 16418.8, 19822.3, 20397, and 100002 of, and to repeal Section 100006 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 11495 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 1019.2 of, and to add Section 1019.4 to, the Labor Code, to amend Sections 6126, 6126.2, 6126.3, 6126.5, and 6133 of the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 27150.2, 27151, and 40610 of the Vehicle Code, relating to state government, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 112 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 112 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (September 10). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2690.) |
2019-09-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1183.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100006 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 12815 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16418.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19822.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 20397 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11495 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1019.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1019.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 6126 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6126.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6126.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6126.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6133 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 27150.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 27151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40610 | Amended Code | Citation Text |