CA AB1130 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1385.035 to, and to add Chapter 2.6 (commencing with Section 127500) to Part 2 of Division 107 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10181.35 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care costs.
Title
California Health Care Quality and Affordability Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1130 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1130 Wood Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1130 Wood Assembly Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 14. Page 1899.) |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 57. Noes 13. Page 1785.) |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 20). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1385.035 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10181.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |