CA AB1139 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1731 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.
Title
Recognition of tribal court money judgments: tribal sales taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-17 - Assembly - AB 1139 Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1139 Garcia et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1139 Garcia Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1139 Garcia et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - AB 1139 Garcia Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 138, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-08-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2023-08-17 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2734.). |
2023-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 1 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1825.). |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1492.) |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1731 | Amended Code | Citation Text |