CA AB1145 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 54715 of the Education Code, relating to pupils.
Title
Pupils: Early Commitment to College program.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1145 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1145 MEDINA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1724.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and ED. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 54715 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 54715.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |