CA AB1161 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Senate committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 41202 of, and to add and repeal Article 7.5 (commencing with Section 8239.5) of Chapter 2 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, the Education Code, and to add and repeal Sections 17053.87 and 23687 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to preschool funding.
Title
Preschool: privately funded pilot program: tax credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1161 OLSEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1161 OLSEN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From Senate committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1724.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 41202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8239.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.87 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23687 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |