CA AB1165 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 22, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 22, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 48900.5 of the Education Code, relating to pupil discipline.
Title
Pupil discipline: racist bullying, harassment, or intimidation: restorative justice practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1165 McCarty et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1165 McCarty Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1165 McCarty Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 22, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-06-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-06-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1575.). |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1466.) |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48900.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |