CA AB1182 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 386, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 386, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 66057, 67312, 81254, 84760.5, 89009, 89753, 100700, 100900, 101034, and 101050 of, to add Sections 66015.10, 66015.12, 66021.1, 66026, 67501, 67502, 67503, 67504, and 92611.9 to, to add Chapter 10.5 (commencing with Section 92830) to Part 57 of Division 9 of Title 3 of, and to repeal Sections 66352 and 71020 of, the Education Code, to repeal Articles 8 (commencing with Section 550) and 10 (commencing with Section 592) of Chapter 3 of Part 1 of Division 1 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Section 67480 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 104145, 104500, and 104530 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1182 BROWNLEY Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1182 Brownley By Simitian (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1182 BROWNLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1182 Brownley By Simitian (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1182 BROWNLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 386, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-09-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2009-09-11 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3359.) | |
2009-09-10 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2009-09-09 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2337.) | |
2009-09-08 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-09-04 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2009-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-29 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2009-06-17 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). | |
2009-05-21 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-05-14 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1470.) | |
2009-05-11 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-07 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6). | |
2009-05-04 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-30 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2009-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |