CA AB1182 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 749, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 749, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21627 of, and to add Section 21628.3 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to secondhand goods.
Title
Secondhand goods: tangible personal property.
Sponsors
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Ken Cooley [D] | Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1182 SANTIAGO Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1182 Santiago By Wieckowski (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1182 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1182 Santiago By Wieckowski (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1182 SANTIAGO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 749, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2990.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3003.). |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2593.). |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-08-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 14). |
2015-07-07 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1691.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 27). |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2080 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 21627 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 21628 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 21628.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |