CA AB1184 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 644, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 644, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5446 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
City and County of San Francisco: local tax: transportation network companies: autonomous vehicles.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1184 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 45 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1184 Ting By Wiener (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - ? (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1184 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE AB1184 Ting By Wiener (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - ? (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1184 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 30 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 644, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 6.) (August 31). |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 6124.). |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 31). |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 6049.) |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 6049.) |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-22 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-09-01 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and EQ. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 2049.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44274.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2835 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5446 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 740.17 | New Code | See Bill Text |