CA AB1208 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 238, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 238, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7284.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Utility user taxes: exemption: clean energy resource.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1208 Ting et al. By McGuire (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1208 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Assembly - AB 1208 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 238, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2238.). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1623.) |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7284.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |