CA AB1217 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 569, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 569, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25750.5 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 65907 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 114067 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to business pandemic relief.
Title
Business pandemic relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Assembly - AB 1217 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1217 Gabriel et al. By Ashby (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1217 Gabriel Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1217 Gabriel et al. By Ashby (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - AB 1217 Gabriel Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 569, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3028.). |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2371.). |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2023-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1596.) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2023-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25750.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65907 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114067 | Amended Code | Citation Text |