CA AB1238 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Referred to Com. on E.Q.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - Referred to Com. on E.Q.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25259 of, and to add Section 25259.1 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to hazardous waste.
Title
Hazardous waste: solar panels.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1238 Ward Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1775.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25259 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25259.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |