CA AB1256 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 852, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 852, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1708.8 of, and to add Section 1708.9 to, the Civil Code, relating to civil law.
Title
Civil law: privacy: entry and exit of facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1256 BLOOM Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1256 Bloom By Evans (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1256 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1256 Bloom By Evans (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - Assembly - AB 1256 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 852, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6646.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 19. Page 6653.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4900.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 17). |
2014-05-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-01-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 3721.) |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1708.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1708.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1798.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |